+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Carlson, A.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Tabke and Lillie
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Howard
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division