+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Scott
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Burkel
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Neu Brindley
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Rasmusson
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Poston
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor