+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date Sec. 1-2 01/01/15; Sec. 3
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 207 05/09/14
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Presentment date
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 54-9)
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1978
- Second reading
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1978, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 118-0)
- Third reading
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 28, 2014
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Clark
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Sundin and Metsa
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Howe
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Masin, Selcer, and Sawatzky
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Erhardt
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Yarusso
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Transportation Policy
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Veterans Affairs
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor