+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 81 05/12/2020
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/12/2020
- Presentment date 05/12/2020
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter number 81
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/12/2020
- Governor approval 05/12/2020
- Presented to Governor 5/12/2020
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Carlson, L. (chief)
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date Sec. 1-2 05/08/20 retroactive; Sec. 3 05/13/20
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass
- Second reading
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 08, 2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Huot
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor