+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Backer
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, return to Ways and Means
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Ecklund
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means