+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Bahner
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Masin
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Sundin and Fischer
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hausman
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Reyer
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor