+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Sandstede.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Kunesh-Podein.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Lillie.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor