+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Erickson.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
- Author added Heintzeman.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor