+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Winkler
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Fischer and Howard
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Wolgamott
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Author changed Vang (made chief author)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Boldon
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On April 17, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Noor
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Greenman
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Gomez
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
- Authors added Moller and Bierman
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Becker-Finn, Schultz, Reyer, Freiberg, Stephenson, Berg, Her, and Huot
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Hanson, J.; Lee; Hollins; Xiong, J.; Jordan; Agbaje; Frazier; Pryor; Acomb; Edelson; Lippert and Vang
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Pinto
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Long
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor