+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
- Author added Hornstein
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Her
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Gomez
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Reyer and Bernardy
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Freiberg and Lippert
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Feist, Hollins and Frazier
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Howard
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor