+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hassan
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Her
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Albright, Moller, Novotny, and Robbins
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Jordan
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor