+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House rule 4.31, notice of request to return bill to the house
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Moran.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Clark.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor