+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Hortman.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Fischer.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Hilstrom and Koegel.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor