+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Kiel.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Smith and McDonald.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Vogel, O'Neill, and Peppin.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Nash.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Barrett and Lueck.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Fabian and Uglem.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor