+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Heinrich
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Drazkowski
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Munson and Bahr
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Lucero
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy