+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF958
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Lueck
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor