+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Jordan
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Her
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, return to Ways and Means
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Xiong, J.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bierman
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Hausman
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, return to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Water Division
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Moller
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor