+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to State Government Finance and Elections
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Division action, return to State Government Finance and Elections
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Local Government Division
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed State Government Finance and Elections
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor