+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Secretary of State Chapter 93
- Governor's action Approval
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Presentment date
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 49-0)
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass
- Second reading
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1305
- General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
- Second reading
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1305, now on General Orders
- Received from House
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 129-0)
- Third reading
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 6, 2013
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to re-refer Ways and Means
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 24, 2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Civil Law
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy