+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Greenman
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Freiberg
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Hamilton, Moller, Kiel and Robbins
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Haley
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Reyer
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor