+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Dean, M.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Maye Quade and Hortman.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Moran.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Lee.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Lillie.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor