+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 22 04/24/13
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Presentment date
On April 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurred and repassed bill
On April 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate (vote: 127-0)
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed (vote: 64-0)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF87
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF87, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 129-0)
- Third reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Urdahl
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Bly and Abeler
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Moran, Clark, Paymar and Slocum
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Veterans Affairs
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor