+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bahr
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Long
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Garofalo
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
- Author added Zerwas
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Elkins
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor