+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Elkins
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Christensen
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Moller
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Lillie
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor