+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Metsa.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Hancock; Green; Heintzeman; Howe; Lueck; Anderson, P.; Dill; Anzelc; and Melin.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Miller.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor