+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Frederick
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Boldon
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Agbaje
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Her
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Fischer
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Xiong, T.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Lillie
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor