+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Author added West.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Kresha.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Education Finance
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Baker and Koegel.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor