+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
- pg. 5168
- pg. 5168
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, February 28, 2022
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Becker-Finn and Youakim
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Long
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Vang
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor