+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Mekeland
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Schomacker
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Demuth
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Runbeck
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Daniels, Urdahl, Lucero, and Robbins
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor