+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- See SF1458 Article 7
- Author added Albright.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Kresha.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Schomacker.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Freiberg and Hornstein.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor