+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- See 2021 First Special Session Chapter 7
- Author added Bernardy
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Greenman
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Xiong, J., and Hornstein
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Moller and Wazlawik
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Berg and Lippert
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Her, Long and Mariani
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Keeler
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Pryor, Davnie
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Freiberg; Becker-Finn; Olson, L.; Feist
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor