+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Flanagan.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Hilstrom as chief author.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Slocum.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Erhardt.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Freiberg and Bly.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor