+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF550
- Author stricken Ecklund.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF550
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 15, 2017
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Lueck.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Ecklund.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor