+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Zerwas.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Atkins.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Lien.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor