+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/17
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 77 05/23/17
- Governor's action Approval 05/23/17
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter number 77
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/23/17
- Governor approval 05/23/17
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/20/17
On May 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/20/17
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
- Third reading Passed as amended
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1224
- Second reading
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1224, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 1, 2017.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor