+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division