+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Elkins
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Brand
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Bierman and Lee
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Hamilton
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor