+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF953
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF953
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, C.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor