+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- See SF1458 Articles 9 and 11
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Kahn.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Backer.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform