+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF716
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF716
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Benson, J.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Energy Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor