+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Fabian.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Lucero
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Layman
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor