+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Isaacson
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, S.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood and Youth Development Policy