+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Demuth
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Reyer as chief author
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Schomacker and Rasmusson
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Freiberg and Liebling
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy