+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- See First Special Session 2021, HF4
- Bill laid on table in House
- pg. 4796
- pg. 3042
- Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
- House conferees Hausman; Howard; Agbaje; Reyer; Theis
- pg. 3040
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- See 2021 First Special Session HF4
- Joint rule 3.02(a), conference committee discharged, bill laid on table
- Senate conferees Draheim; Duckworth; Dahms; Pratt; Dziedzic
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- House conferees Hausman, Howard, Agbaje, Reyer, Theis
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 3022 vote: 39-27
- pg. 3020a
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 2953a
- pg. 2954
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF969 now on General Orders
- pg. 2914
- pg. 2914
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
- Amendments offered
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 15, 2021
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy