+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 7, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Moller
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Dehn
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Baker
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Elkins
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to re-refer Ways and Means
- Author added Bernardy
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Xiong, J.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Hassan
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Author added McDonald
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor