+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Stephenson
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Koegel and Bernardy
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Huot and Feist
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Lippert, Hollins and Freiberg
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Reyer
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Olson, L.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Davnie, Sundin and Vang
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor