+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/13
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 8/1/2013
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 74 05/14/13
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 74
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/14/13
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/14/13
- Governor approval 05/14/13
- Returned from Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/13/13
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 37-30)
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
- Presentment date 05/13/13
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF925
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 75-59)
- Amended
- Third reading as amended
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF925, now on General Orders
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Falk
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 9, 2013
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to re-refer Ways and Means
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Liebling and Fischer
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, S.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Hornstein
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Bly
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Dehn, R.; Paymar; Davnie; Laine; Wagenius and Isaacson
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor