+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/16
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 125 05/19/16
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/19/16
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter number 125
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/19/16
- Governor approval 05/19/16
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/17/16
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/17/16
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- House adopted HCC report and repassed bill
- Third reading
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- House adopted conference committee report
- Conference committee report, delete everything
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Isaacson.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Eaton; Kiffmeyer; Wiklund
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Senate conferees Eaton, Kiffmeyer, and Wiklund.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
- House conferees Baker; Mack; Hilstrom
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- House conferees Baker, Mack, and Hilstrom.
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Third reading Passed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF454
- Second reading
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF454, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 06, 2015
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor