+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Sauke and Long
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Lippert
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Ecklund, Bierman, Fischer, and Noor
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Huot, Olson, Youakim, and Carlson, A.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor