+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF524
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Haley, Dettmer
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy